Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakub Sienieński (z Sienna)

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1413²Born
24 Nov 146047.8AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
31 May 146148.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
7 Jan 146249.0ResignedBishop of Kraków, Poland
19 Oct 146451.7AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
17 Dec 147360.9AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
4 Oct 148067.7DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakub Sienieński (z Sienna)
Archbishop Jakub Sienieński (z Sienna) (born 1413, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienna
Ordained BishopPinczow
Death PlaceLowicz

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,893
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139, and Page 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 270
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,614
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1461, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast