Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Konarski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1447¹Born
1492¹45.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 150356.5AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
1 Oct 150356.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
6 Apr 152477.2ResignedBishop of Kraków, Poland
3 Apr 152578.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Konarski (VIAF: 303621003)
Bishop Jan Konarski (born 1447, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKonary
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,259
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast