Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Strzępiński

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1398Born
25 Sep 145557.1AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
25 Jan 145657.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
22 Sep 146062.1DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Strzępiński (VIAF: 169819370)
Bishop Tomasz Strzępiński (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrzempin
Ordained BishopN-D et St Stanislaw, Church, Bodzentyn
Death PlaceIlza

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,892
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,604
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1456, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast