Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Krasiński

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1525Born
2 Jun 157247.1AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
6 Jan 157347.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
16 Mar 157751.9DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Krasiński (VIAF: 163391774)
Bishop Franciszek Krasiński (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrasne
Ordained Bishopcollégiale St Jean Baptiste, Warszawa
Death PlaceBodzentyn

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast