Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wojciech Jastrzębiec

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1362¹Born
1384¹22.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 139937.3AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
9 Aug 141250.6AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
9 Jul 142361.5AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
2 Sep 143674.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Jastrzębiec
Archbishop Wojciech Jastrzębiec (born 1362, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁubnicach

  • a priest for 52.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 265, and Page 214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 408
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast