Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wincenty Saryusz Karol Skórkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1768¹BornJankowice
1 Jul 182860.5SelectedBishop of Kraków, Poland
27 Jul 182961.5ConfirmedBishop of Kraków, Poland
24 Jan 183062.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
25 Jan 185183.0DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Saryusz Karol Skórkowski (VIAF: 55256375)
Bishop Wincenty Saryusz Karol Skórkowski (born 1768, died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 16 Jul 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 166
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016