Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kanty Leńczowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1721BornKamieńsk
8 Aug 175129.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 176745.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
31 Aug 176745.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
18 Oct 176745.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
24 Aug 180785.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Kanty Leńczowski
Bishop Jan Kanty Leńczowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 61, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,653
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016