Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Oborski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611²Born
1636²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 165847.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
18 Mar 165847.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria
4 Aug 165847.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria
16 Apr 168978.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Oborski:
Bishop Mikołaj Oborski (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 214
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 235
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,948

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014