Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominik Malachowski, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470¹Born
3 Apr 152757.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
3 Apr 152757.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
20 Sep 152858.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
15 Mar 1544³74.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominik Malachowski:
Bishop Dominik Malachowski O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 218
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013