Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Rzeszowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1411¹Born
1453¹42.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 147160.8AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
19 Jan 147261.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kraków, Poland
28 Feb 148877.1DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Rzeszowski (VIAF: 386151778199518130007)
Bishop Jan Rzeszowski (born 1411, died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,520
  • c3: CB, 30 Jun 2015
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,514
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1472, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast