Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jan Aleksander Cardinal Lipski

Deceased

Bishop of Krakˇw, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1690Born
1 Apr 171322.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Apr 171726.8Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 173241.7AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
25 May 173241.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
19 Dec 173242.5AppointedBishop of Krakˇw, Poland
20 Dec 173747.5Elevated to Cardinal
20 Feb 174655.6DiedBishop of Krakˇw, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Aleksander Lipski
Jan Aleksander Cardinal Lipski (born , died ) Bishop of Krakˇw

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuczkov

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1737
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1732, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 13 Sep 2018

Quantcast