Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michał Szembek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Paphus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1665¹BornMorawicy
13 Sep 170641.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
13 Sep 170641.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
30 Nov 170641.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
19 Jun 172661.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Michał Szembek:
Bishop Michał Szembek (born 1665, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 306
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,640
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015