Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Olechowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Verinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1735BornLubartów
22 Mar 176024.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 178650.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
3 Apr 178650.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
16 Jul 178651.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
18 Jan 180973.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Olechowski:
Bishop Józef Olechowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 438
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,283
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,657

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013