Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Stanisław Załuski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1695BornJedlińsk
22 Nov 172328.8AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
13 Feb 172429.1Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
19 Nov 173641.8AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
8 Mar 173944.1SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
20 Jul 173944.5ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
5 Jan 174045.0InstalledBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
12 Mar 174651.1SelectedBishop of Kraków, Poland
2 May 174651.3ConfirmedBishop of Kraków, Poland
16 Dec 175863.9DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Stanisław Załuski:
Bishop Andrzej Stanisław Załuski (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185, and Page 188
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015