Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Tomiczki

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1464²BornTomice
1511²47.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 151450.4AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
18 Feb 151551.1Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
22 Jun 152056.5AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
9 Dec 152359.9AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
10 Oct 153571.8DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr Tomiczki:
Bishop Piotr Tomiczki (died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 24.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 279
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,909

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014