Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janusz Edward Mastalski

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Noba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1964 Born
7 May 198824.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
21 May 198925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
3 Dec 201854.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
3 Dec 201854.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Noba
5 Jan 201954.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Noba

MicroData Summary for Janusz Edward Mastalski
Bishop Janusz Edward Mastalski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Ordained BishopSts. Stanislaus and Wenceslaus, Wawel Hill, Cathedral Basilica, Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2/mn: CB, 3 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast