Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest

Archidioecesis Strigoniensis-Budapestinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Péter Erdő, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Ferenc Cserháti, Auxiliary Bishop
  • János Székely, Auxiliary Bishop
  • László Paskai, O.F.M., Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Gáspár Ladocsi, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 31 May 1993
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Hungary
  • Square Kilometers: 1,543 (595 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.esztergomi-ersekseg.hu/
  • Mailing Address: Primasi es Erseki Hivatal, Uri utca 62, Pf. 1, H-1024 Budapest; Primasi es Ereski Hivatal, Mindszenty hercegprimas tere 2, Pf. 25, H-2501 Esztergom, Magyarorszag
  • Telephone: (1)225-2590; (33)510-120
  • Fax: 202-5458; 411-085

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Archdiocese of Esztergom
10th CenturyErectedArchdiocese of Esztergom (erected)
24 March 1452ElevatedArchdiocese of Esztergom (became Primatial See)
13 March 1776Territory LostArchdiocese of Esztergom Diocese of Banská Bystrica (erected)
13 March 1776Territory LostArchdiocese of Esztergom Diocese of Rožňava (erected)
13 March 1776Territory LostArchdiocese of Esztergom Diocese of Spiš
29 May 1922Territory LostArchdiocese of Esztergom Apostolic Administration of Trnava (erected)
Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest
31 May 1993Name ChangedArchdiocese of Esztergom Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Esztergom
1948818,7731,236,39266.2%5206711,1916874532,451167ap1951
1970750,0001,710,00043.9%5121206321,18613020162ap1971
1980798,0001,920,00041.6%4024021,9852020158ap1981
1990949,1151,541,97361.6%308974052,34316739154ap1991
Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest
19991,258,0002,094,00060.1%2671944612,72813280714149ap2000
20001,258,0002,094,00060.1%2691193883,24214241768149ap2001
20011,258,0002,094,00060.1%2391203593,50415255723149ap2002
20021,258,0002,930,00042.9%2341243583,51317173699149ap2003
20031,258,0002,094,00060.1%2451243693,40917173699151ap2004
20041,258,0002,094,00060.1%2601103703,40016155664151ap2005
20061,264,8672,100,00060.2%2301683983,17819224551152ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 22 Sep 2013