Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul de Révay

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1696³Born
12 Mar 175356.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
12 Mar 175356.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
29 Apr 175356.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
13 Dec 177679.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Paul de Révay
Bishop Paul de Révay (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrecopensi
Ordained BishopTirnovo

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 195, and Page 453
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 7
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast