Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Bubnić

Deceased

Bishop of Rožňava, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1877Born
22 Jun 190023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
31 Oct 192548.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rožňava, Slovakia
31 Oct 192548.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
8 Dec 192548.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium
19 Jul 193962.1AppointedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
22 Feb 194567.7DiedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Michal Bubnić
Bishop Michal Bubnić (born , died ) Bishop of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorinka

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Mar 2019

Quantcast