Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)

Archidioecesis Fagarasiensis et Albae Iuliensis Romenorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Lucian Mureşan, Cardinal, Major Archbishop
  • Claudiu-Lucian Pop, Curial Bishop
  • Mihai Cătălin Frăţilă, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 16 November 1854
  • Major Archbishopric
  • Romanian Catholic Church of the Byzantine Tradition
  • Country: Romania
  • Mailing Address: Str. Petru Pavel Aron 2, RO-515400 Blaj, AB. Romania
  • Telephone: (0258)71.06.08; 71.20.57
  • Fax: 71.36.02

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Făgăraş (Romanian)
18 May 1721ErectedDiocese of Făgăraş (Romanian) (erected)
Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)
16 November 1854Name ChangedDiocese of Făgăraş (Romanian) Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)
16 December 2005ElevatedArchdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian) (became a Major Archbishopric)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)
1948412,48617,000,0002.4%6478655629173606ap1991
1999362,00018971961,846110130624ap2000
2000360,00019782051,756111157175ap2001
2001360,00021072171,658212164624ap2002
2002360,00022292311,558213170184ap2003
2003358,00021972261,58410170184ap2004
2004350,00021552201,5907155189ap2005
2006367,0002122121,7316160624ap2007
2009289,00021152161,3376158624ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013