Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miklós József Csáky

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1698Born
7 Mar 173738.2SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
16 Dec 173739.0ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
2 Feb 173839.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
31 May 174748.4SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
4 Sep 174748.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
30 Jul 175152.6SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
15 Nov 175152.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
31 May 175758.4DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Miklós József Csáky
Archbishop Miklós József Csáky (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeuchowicz
Ordained BishopKosice

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,119
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173, and Page 387
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 432
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast