Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Székely

Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1964 Born
2 Mar 199126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
14 Nov 200743.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
14 Nov 200743.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Febiana
5 Jan 200843.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Febiana
18 Jun 201753.0AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
8 Jul 201753.0InstalledBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Székely (VIAF: 19513748)
Bishop János Székely (born ) Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Szombathely.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,584
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017