Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Boltizár

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Mylasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1821Born
13 Jul 184423.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
15 Jul 184423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Aug 187554.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Aug 187554.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
24 Oct 187554.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
17 May 190584.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Boltizár
Bishop József Boltizár (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoravský Svätý Ján, Slovakia
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 398
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 74
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Jul 2017