Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Palánki

Bishop of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1964 BornBalassagyarmat
18 Jun 199430.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
27 Dec 201046.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
27 Dec 201046.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Fidoloma
26 Feb 201146.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fidoloma
21 Sep 201551.5AppointedBishop of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza, Hungary
14 Nov 201551.6InstalledBishop of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Palánki:
Bishop Ferenc Palánki (born ) Bishop of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,960
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015