Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter de Ürményi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1768³Born
17 Jun 179122.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Jun 179123.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 182052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
28 Aug 182052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
5 Nov 182052.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
15 Nov 183971.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter de Ürményi
Bishop Peter de Ürményi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagysztricze

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast