Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Snell

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Pudentiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1949Born
3 Apr 197223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
1993²43.8IncardinatedPriest of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
20 Oct 201465.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
20 Oct 201465.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
6 Dec 201465.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
26 Feb 202171.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Snell
Bishop György Snell (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKiskirályság
Ordained BishopSzent István, Basilica, Budapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2014
  • ob: CB, 20 Oct 2014
  • c2: CB, 29 Nov 2014
  • c34: CB, 6 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast