Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Rózsavölgyi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Lystra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1919Born
14 Jun 194223.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 1960³41.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
5 Nov 196041.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
2 Aug 198768.3DiedTitular Bishop of Lystra

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for László Rózsavölgyi
Bishop László Rózsavölgyi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Lystra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagylók, Diocese of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
Ordained PriestEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary
Ordained Bishop(in secret), Budapest
Death PlaceBudapest

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 17 Jul 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,419
  • ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Sep 2017