Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Majthényi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1780Born
26 Aug 180323.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Aug 180323.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 184060.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
14 Dec 184060.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
21 Mar 184161.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
19 Dec 185676.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Antonio Majthényi
Bishop Antonio Majthényi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBisztricsény
Ordained BishopCathedral, Esztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 145
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast