Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Spiš

Dioecesis Scepusiensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Štefan Sečka, Bishop
  • Andrej Imrich, Auxiliary Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 13 March 1776
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Košice
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Slovakia
  • Square Kilometers: 7,802 (3,013 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kapitula.sk/
  • Mailing Address: Biskupsky urad, Spisska Kapitula 9, SK 053 04 Spisske Podhradie, Slovenska Republika
  • Telephone: (053)454.11.36
  • Fax: 450.22.08

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
13 March 1776ElevatedArchdiocese of Esztergom Diocese of Spiš
30 December 1977Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Spiš (from Esztergom)
31 March 1995Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Spiš (from Trnava)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949306,931324,78094.5%264423061,00353485162ap1951
1969392,594479,00582.0%1871872,09919152ap1971
1980411,137504,84181.4%203252281,80329139155ap1981
1990439,392546,41380.4%186422281,92744206155ap1991
1999432,382581,92074.3%286343201,35140300172ap2000
2000435,894585,43274.5%291313221,35337307172ap2001
2001426,818572,00874.6%292343261,30944318173ap2002
2002441,554584,66775.5%295423371,31049286175ap2003
2003446,651600,03374.4%303423451,29458277177ap2004
2004447,050583,63376.6%305423471,28858282177ap2005
2010454,630603,60075.3%299403391,34148294177ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013