Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Breyer

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1880BornBudapest
18 Jan 190322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
5 Apr 192948.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
5 Apr 192948.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Trisipa
19 May 192948.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trisipa
13 Dec 193353.3AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
1 Jan 193453.4InstalledBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
28 Sep 194060.1DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for István Breyer:
Bishop István Breyer (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015