Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan László

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Eisenstadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1913BornBratislava, Slovakia
19 Jul 193623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Burgenland, Austria
30 Jan 195440.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Burgenland, Austria
20 Sep 195643.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
11 Nov 195643.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
14 Oct 196047.6AppointedBishop of Eisenstadt, Austria
11 Nov 196047.7InstalledBishop of Eisenstadt, Austria
28 Dec 199279.8RetiredBishop of Eisenstadt, Austria
7 Mar 199582.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Eisenstadt, Austria

MicroData Summary for Stefan László:
Bishop Stefan László (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Eisenstadt

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013