Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miklós Oláh

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1493Born
154349.9AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
4 Jul 155057.4AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
3 Aug 155461.5AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
14 Jan 156875.0DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Miklós Oláh (VIAF: 9923869)
Archbishop Miklós Oláh (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSibiu

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 98, and Page 304
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 35*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast