Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Vajda

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Cartennae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1912Born
29 Oct 193624.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 196956.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
10 Jan 196956.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cartennae
12 Feb 196956.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cartennae
8 Jul 197865.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Vajda
Bishop József Vajda (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopSaint-Etienne, Basilica, Budapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Death PlaceVác, Diocese of Vác

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 7 Mar 2019

Quantcast