Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Kiss-Rigó

Bishop of Szeged-Csanád


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1955 BornBudapest
14 Jun 198126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Jan 200448.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
24 Jan 200448.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
21 Feb 200448.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
20 Jun 200651.2AppointedBishop of Szeged-Csanád, Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Kiss-Rigó:
Bishop László Kiss-Rigó (born ) Bishop of Szeged-Csanád

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Szeged-Csanád.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013