Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vilmos Dékány, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest

Titular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1925BornKecskemét
14 Jun 195328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
23 Dec 198863.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
23 Dec 198863.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
11 Feb 198963.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
19 May 200075.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Vilmos Dékány:
Bishop Vilmos Dékány Sch. P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,135
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013