Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop György Szelepcsényi

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹BornSelepschin
5 Sep 164450.6SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
18 Apr 164854.2SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
14 Mar 165258.2ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
15 Jun 166672.4SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
22 Aug 166773.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
10 Jan 1685³91.0DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Szelepcsényi:
Archbishop György Szelepcsényi (born 1594, died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 156, and Page 260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 323, and Page 366
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 378, and Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015