Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Eger

Archidioecesis Agriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Csaba Ternyák, Archbishop
  • Ferenc Palánki, Auxiliary Bishop
  • István Seregély, Archbishop Emeritus
  • István Katona, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 9 August 1804
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Hungary
  • Square Kilometers: 11,500 (4,441 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.eger.egyhazmegye.hu/
  • Mailing Address: Szechenyi u. 1, Pf. 80, H-3301 Eger, Magyarorszag
  • Telephone: (36)517-589; 517-750
  • Fax: 517-751

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Eger
10th CenturyErectedDiocese of Eger (erected)
Archdiocese of Eger
9 August 1804ElevatedDiocese of Eger Archdiocese of Eger
10 August 1804Territory LostArchdiocese of Eger Diocese of Košice (erected)
31 May 1993Territory LostArchdiocese of Eger
Diocese of Szeged-Csanád
Diocese of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Eger
1948990,2331,582,04762.6%45774642,134192696282ap1951
19701,000,0001,800,00055.6%4764762,100303ap1971
1980899,0001,371,00065.6%3723722,416302ap1981
19901,121,000371294002,80229440ap1991
1999600,000950,00063.2%203212242,67812239313ap2000
2000595,000945,00063.0%198232212,69212441313ap2001
2001595,000945,00063.0%209292382,50023542313ap2002
2002690,0001,210,00057.0%205252303,00023342314ap2003
2003690,0001,260,00054.8%208252332,96123343314ap2004
2004690,0001,260,00054.8%199352342,94823749314ap2005
2006690,0001,260,00054.8%197262233,09483040314ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 20 Oct 2014