Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferenc Cardinal Forgách de Ghymes

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566²BornEsztergom, Hungary
22 Dec 158721.9AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
10 Jul 159630.5SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
2 Apr 159933.2ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
30 Apr 160034.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
5 Nov 160741.8AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
10 Dec 160741.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Oct 161549.7DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Forgách de Ghymes:
Ferenc Cardinal Forgách de Ghymes (died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1607
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,348
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 259, and Page 331
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015