Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Görgey

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1740BornPéch-Ujfalu
18 Dec 176222.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Nov 176323.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 180463.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Sep 180463.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
1 Nov 180464.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara
23 Aug 180766.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Martin Görgey:
Bishop Martin Görgey (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013