Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mátyás Tarnóczy

Deceased

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornZemianske Kostoľany
24 Feb 163924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
4 Apr 165035.2AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
18 Sep 165035.7Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
14 Jun 165540.4AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
30 Aug 165540.6DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mátyás Tarnóczy:
Bishop Mátyás Tarnóczy (died ) Bishop of Vác

  • a priest for 16.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 169, and Page 356
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 25 Mar 2015