Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gábor Mohos

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Iliturgi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1973 Born
19 Jun 199925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
4 Oct 201845.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
4 Oct 201845.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Iliturgi
8 Dec 201845.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iliturgi

MicroData Summary for Gábor Mohos
Father Gábor Mohos (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Esztergom-Budapest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopBasilica, Esztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Oct 2018

Quantcast