Catholic-Hierarchy DC

János Cardinal Csernoch

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1852BornSzakolcza
18 Nov 187422.4Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
19 Feb 190855.7AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
10 May 190855.9Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
8 Mar 191158.7SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
20 Apr 191158.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
13 Dec 191260.5AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
25 May 191461.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Sep 191462.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
25 Jul 192775.1DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Csernoch:
Cardinal János Csernoch (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
  • a cardinal for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013