Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juraj Cardinal Haulík Váralyai

Deceased

Archbishop of Zagreb

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1787³BornTrnave, Slovakia
3 Dec 181023.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Apr 181124.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 183750.1SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
2 Oct 183750.5ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
10 Dec 183750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
11 Dec 185265.6AppointedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
16 Jun 185669.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 185769.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
11 May 186982.1DiedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juraj Haulík Váralyai:
Cardinal Juraj Haulík Váralyai (born , died ) Archbishop of Zagreb

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
  • a cardinal for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013