Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alexander (Sandor) Cardinal Rudnay Divékújfalusi

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1760³BornSzentkereszt (Povazany), Slovakia
26 May 178322.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Oct 178323.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 181554.9SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
8 Mar 181655.4ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
21 Apr 181655.5Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
28 Jul 181958.8SelectedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
17 Dec 181959.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
2 Oct 182665.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Dec 182868.1Elevated to Cardinal
13 Sep 183170.9DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander (Sandor) Rudnay Divékújfalusi
Alexander (Sandor) Cardinal Rudnay Divékújfalusi (born , died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 10
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 353, and Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 12 Feb 2016