Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozsef Medard Kohl, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Samosata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1859Born
25 Jul 188525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Dec 190041.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
17 Dec 190041.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
27 Dec 190041.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
15 Jan 192868.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Jozsef Medard Kohl
Bishop Jozsef Medard Kohl O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRudersdorf
Ordained BishopS. Martin aux Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 498
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast