Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton de Révay

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1718BornSzucsany
25 Feb 174122.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
12 Mar 174123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
20 May 175436.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
20 May 175436.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
Jun 1754²36.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
19 Apr 177658.1SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
16 Sep 177658.5ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
23 Jun 178062.2SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
18 Sep 178062.5ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
26 Dec 178365.8DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton de Révay:
Bishop Anton de Révay (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 289, and Page 312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 359, and Page 453
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015