Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop István Fejérkövy

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
26 Jan 157149.0AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
15 May 157351.3AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
19 Dec 158765.9AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
7 Jun 159674.4AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
20 Nov 159674.8DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for István Fejérkövy
Archbishop István Fejérkövy (born 1522, died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKóny

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 304, and Page 259
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 314, and Page 331
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast