Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Kolos Ferenc Cardinal Vaszary, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Esztergom, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1832Born
1847¹14.8EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Jun 185422.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Jul 185422.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
26 May 185624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Dec 189159.8AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
7 Feb 189259.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
16 Jan 189360.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 189361.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
Nov 1912³80.7RetiredArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
3 Sep 191583.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kolos Ferenc Vaszary (VIAF: 89444909)
Kolos Ferenc Cardinal Vaszary O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSüdwestungarn, Diocese of Veszprém
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Death PlaceBalatonfueuered
Buried Place (Original)St. Martin al Monte Pannonia archabbey

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
  • a cardinal for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 528, and Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017