Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Ignatius Frivaisz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1682BornPresbourg
20 Jun 170623.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Oct 170624.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 174461.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
3 Feb 174461.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
7 Oct 174866.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Michael Ignatius Frivaisz:
Bishop Michael Ignatius Frivaisz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

  • a priest for 41.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 225, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015