Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Dubovský, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica

Titular Bishop of Carcabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1921BornRakovice
24 Dec 195029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 May 196139.8Ordained BishopBishop
12 Jan 199169.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
12 Jan 199169.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Carcabia
30 Jul 199776.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
10 Apr 200886.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Peter Dubovský:
Bishop Peter Dubovský S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Banská Bystrica

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,373
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015